Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cashcall Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Bonge, Sandra S, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* Notes: SACRAMENTO COUNTY ISSUED 5-5-08. |
|
October 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF. |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SACRAMENTO COUNTY. |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: MEMO OF COSTS: -0-; CREDITS: -0-; INTEREST: $29.93. |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL PLTFF PRESENT DEF NP Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED: SANDRA B. BONGE ON 1-2-08 BY SUB-SERVICE. F EE: $52.91. |
|
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.