Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cashcall Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Melendez, Laura M, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time27 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED: LAURA M. MELENDEZ ON 1-7-08 BY SUB-SERVICE. FEE: $52.50. |
|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.