Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mummert, Carrie, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Ritter, Sean, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL REFEREE REED CLERKS NAVARRETTE/GUEVARA PLAINTIFF APPEARING DEFENDANT NOT APPEARING WITNESS SWORN PLAINTIFF SWORN & TESTIFIED Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: Sean Ritter by personal service on 1-9-07. F ee: $0.00.//RP |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.