Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Roca, Kristin L, Roca, Willy A, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Kirkham, Terry, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time58 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter Received LTR FROM DEFENDANT |
|
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL REFEREE REED CLERK NAVARRETTE PLAINTIFFS APPEARING DEFENDANT APPEARING WITNESS SWORN PLAINTIFFS SWORN & TESTIFIED DEFENDANT SWORN & TESTIFIED Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL MATTER DROPPED FROM CALENDAR - NO APPEARANCES Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipt POS BY CERT MAIL-SC Notes: RECEIPT RETURNED, SIGNED ON (NO DATE) BY CAROL HICKS. MAY NOT BE PROPER SERVICE. |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.