Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pacific Gas & Elec, Tric Co Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Trg Construction, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time3333 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER* | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
506 MTN DISM LACK PROSEC Motion to Dismiss Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL NO APPEARANCES/NO SERVICE Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Filed AUTHORIZATION Notes: AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLA IMS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.