Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vega, Gilbert M, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Zinsli, S, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CERTIFIED MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court COMMISSIONER BERONIO CLERK MEADOWS WITNESS SWORN PLAINTIFF SWORN & TESTIFIED DEFENDANT SWORN & TESTIFIED COMPLAINT AMMENDED TO REFLECT WPD AS PROPER DEFENSE S. LINSLI STICKEN FROM COMPLAINT Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVERD: S. ZINSLI ON 1-12-06 BY SUB-SERVISE TO: KAREN HEIN, POLICE AID. FEE: $30.00.//RP |
|
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.