Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Henderson, Mark, Cabrera, Angelica, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Ld Enterprises Llc, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time125 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF. |
|
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation MEDIATION AGRM FILED |
|
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event | STIPULATION REACHED | |
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court COMMISSIONER BERONIO CLERK MEADOWS STIP REACHED Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Amended SC - No Fee AMEND CLM OF PLTFF Notes: AMENDED CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY PLAINTIFF TO CHANGE AGENT FOR SERVICE FOR DEF FROM: DUY LE TO: LEE PHAM. |
|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed CERT LTR RET REF/UNC Notes: REFUSED/UNCLAIMED: ADDRESSED TO: LD ENTERPRISES LLC |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CERT MAIL SENT* Notes: CERTIFIED MAIL #7160 3901 9848 9524 7850 LD ENTERPRISES LLC (AGENT: DUY LE) |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.