Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Meith, Melissa M, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Philip, John, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time34 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: YOLO COUNTY |
|
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CERTIFIED MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court COMMISSIONER BERONIO CLERK MEADOWS WITNESS SWORN PLAINTIFF S&T DEF/MINOR NOT PRESENT Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED: JOHN PHILIP DBA: COURTESY CLEANERS BY SUB-SERVICE TO: ASHLEY REYNOLDS, COUNTER PERSON. FEE: $ -0-. |
|
December 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.