Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mendoza, Jose C, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Sierra Hart Tow, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time78 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Destroyed EXHIBITS DESTROYED |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC OF ENTRY JDGM SC Notes: AND CERTIFIED MAILING TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court COMMISSIONER BERONIO CLERK MEADOWS WITNESS SWORN PLAINTIFF S&T DEFENDANT S&T Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED: AGENT FOR SERVICE: RICK A. HART ON 12-28-05 BY SUB-SERVICE TO: ALAN SLAPE, SERVICE MANAGER. FEE: $30.00. |
|
December 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS Notes: PLAINTIFF PHONED AND CORRECTED ADDRESS AS FOLLOWS: 4251 FELL ST., SACRAMENTO, CA 95838 |
|
December 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.