Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American General, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Gutierrez, Jose M, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions3555 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time3555 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER DISMISSING FOR DELAY IN PROSECTUTON | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
506 MTN DISM LACK PROSEC Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.