Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ddc Foodservice, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Amiri, Naeem, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time3511 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MAIN SHELF: OUT CARD |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IN FULL |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* Notes: EL DORADO COUNTY ISSUED 10-10-12. |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: EL DORADO COUNTY. |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: MEMO OF COSTS: $75.00; CREDITS: -0-; INTEREST: $449.99. |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Review GEROGE SOMERS PRESENT FOR PLTF DEF NOT WARRANT SIGNED AND FILED IN COURT Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.