Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hertz Equipment Re, Ntal Corpora Tion A Delaw, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Vannucci, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2004 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions3803 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time3803 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES CASE DISMISSED Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
April 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED: RONALD VANNUCCI ON 3-13-05 BY SUB-SERVICE TO: "JOHN DOE." FEE: $60.00. |
|
March 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
February 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Letter Received LTR RECEIVED Notes: LETTER RECEIVED FROM PLAINTIFF TO RE-SET COURT DATE DUE TO NO SERVICE. |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.