Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
David E Ambrosio filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Michael J. Torchia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Torchia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2006 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY VANESSA SAUCEDA - Minutes Pre-D Complete JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD REPORTER: JEAN THOMPSON BAILIFF: J CEBALLOS - APPEARANCES: RESPONDENT DAVID E AMBROSIO PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VANESSA SAUCEDA - PROCEEDINGS: WITNESS -- DAVID AMBROSIO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. FAMILY COURT SERVICES REPORT FILED. - THE COURT FINDS IT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CHILD CUSTODY UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT. CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDERED COURT MAKES ORDERS PURSUANT TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES REPORT. WRITTEN REPORT RECEIVED FROM FAMILY COURT SERVICES MEDIATOR P. TERMINI. PERMANENT TRO IS DENIED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. |
|
October 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS DESTRUCTION YEAR ADDED Not Applicable |
|
October 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
FAMILY COURT SERVICES: FCS MEDIATION DATE 10-19-06 @ 1:00 PM Not Applicable |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
VANESSA SAUCEDA IS DIRECTED TO REPORT TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FORTHWITH FOR ORIENTATION AND MEDIATION APPOINTMENTS. Not Applicable |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSMITTED TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES, ADVISING OF REFERRAL. Not Applicable |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION)FILED BY VANESSA SAUCEDA Not Applicable |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE HEARING RE:TEMPORARY ORDERS (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION)REQUEST FILED BY VANESSA SAUCEDA - Minutes Pre-D Complete M J TORCHIA PRESIDING. CLERK: ROSEMARY ROJAS NOT REPORTED BAILIFF: L SCOTT - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER VANESSA SAUCEDA PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD. EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED EX PARTE ORDER SIGNED BY THE COURT. - HEARINGS: HEARING DATE OF 10/30/06 CONFIRMED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: M J TORCHIA PRESIDING. |
|
October 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST AND ORDER FOR FREE SERVICE OF RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY VANESSA SAUCEDA AND DOES QUALIFY. Not Applicable |
|
October 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ORDER DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION Not Applicable |
|
October 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.(DV) Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.