Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gerard Quainoo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kathryn Quainoo, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Christina J. Ferrante presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristina J. Ferrante Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management209 days |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions376 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time419 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILING FEE PAID BY KATHRYN QUAINOO FOR COPIES Not Applicable |
|
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT VACATED |
|
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED. CHRISTINA FERRANTE WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. GERARD QUAINOO IS NOW REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. Not Applicable |
|
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
UPDATE PARTY ADDRESS FOR GERARD QUAINOO. Not Applicable |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 10/10/07 | |
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION FILED (UNCONTESTED) Not Applicable |
|
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL. Not Applicable |
|
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
COURT NOW RULES -- STAT CASE FOR 2C REPORT Not Applicable |
|
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.