Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Minaberri, Anne Marie, Minaberrigarai, Dominique, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Cynthia L. Loo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia L. Loo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2015 |
CategoryOther Probate With One Hearing |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time144 days |
Petition to Determine Succession
Date: July 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2015 | Hearing |
Order Determining Succession
Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition to Determine Succession NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Original will is not lodged with the Court and an endorsed copy showing the R/W number should be filed in case #64772. 2. Petitioner's/Dominique name in petition & I & A do not match signature (full name vs. initial). How does petitioner request to be appointed? Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 3. Need proof of mailing for Amelia Minaberrigarai. |
|
July 23, 2015 | Hearing |
4043 Petition to Determine Succession Hearing Entered. |
|
July 23, 2015 | Hearing |
Petition to Determine Succession NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Original will is not lodged with the Court and an endorsed copy showing the R/W number should be filed in case #64772. 2. Petitioner's/Dominique name in petition & I & A do not match signature (full name vs. initial). How does petitioner request to be appointed? Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 3. Need proof of mailing for Amelia Minaberrigarai. Judge: Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
4043 Petition to Determine Succession Hearing Entered. |
|
July 22, 2015 | Hearing |
Supplement To Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Supplement To Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property |
|
April 01, 2015 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing 7/23/2015 @ 9:00AM IN DIV. P |
|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 7/23/2015 @ 9:00AM IN DIV. P |
|
March 10, 2015 | Hearing |
882D PMT: Probate Petition Commencing Other Proceedings GC Amount of $435.00 for MINABERRI, ANNE MARIE (PE-1). Received from LEBEAU THELEN, check no(s) 34206. Receipt #827768 for amount of $435.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.