Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carmona, Diana, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carmona, Luis J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Fielder Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time111 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2010 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
April 13, 2010 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RETURNED TO NIEVES RUBIO: ITEM 1B INCOMPLETE |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RETURNED TO NIEVES RUBIO: ITEM 1B INCOMPLETE |
|
April 08, 2010 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY:NIEVES RUBIO NEW ATTORNEY:IN PRO PER |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY:NIEVES RUBIO NEW ATTORNEY:IN PRO PER |
|
April 06, 2010 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RETURNED TO NIEVES RUBIO: EXPIRED FORM |
|
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RETURNED TO NIEVES RUBIO: EXPIRED FORM |
|
January 19, 2010 | Hearing |
Cause Dropped DROPPED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL. |
|
January 19, 2010 | Hearing |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.