Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Suzuki, Akira, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Suzuki, Alexandra Marie, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Fielder Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions959 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1241 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2011 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
May 16, 2011 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS 5/16/2011 JLC |
|
May 16, 2011 | Hearing |
Judgm/Disso By Decl Granted JLC |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgm/Disso By Decl Granted JLC |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS 5/16/2011 JLC |
|
May 13, 2011 | Hearing | Request to Enter Default | |
May 13, 2011 | Hearing | Declaration for Default | |
February 14, 2011 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT VIA PRO PER BIN(MAILED REJECTION NOTICE) POS ON 2ND AMENDED PETITION/SUMMONS REQUIRED; FL 165#5 DATED MROE THAN 90 DAYS; FL 180 #2 INCORRECT; FL 180 #3 DATE INCORRECT; NEW ENVELOPE FOR PETITIONER |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT VIA PRO PER BIN(MAILED REJECTION NOTICE) POS ON 2ND AMENDED PETITION/SUMMONS REQUIRED; FL 165#5 DATED MROE THAN 90 DAYS; FL 180 #2 INCORRECT; FL 180 #3 DATE INCORRECT; NEW ENVELOPE FOR PETITIONER |
|
October 06, 2010 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFAULT RETURNED TO PETITIONER (PICK UP): JUDGMENT DOES NOT CONFORM TO PETITION; FL-180 #3 IS INCORRECT; FL-180 #4F IS INCORRECT; FL-180 #4 IS INCOMPLETE *COPY OF REJECTION NOTICE MAILED TO PETITIONER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.