Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Hering, Daniel J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph L. McKnight, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions231 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time3143 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2016 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing HRG 7/26/16 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing HRG 7/26/16 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
July 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS IMPUTE EARNINGS 1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS IMPUTE EARNINGS 1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
June 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS IMPUTE EARNINGS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 7/26/16 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS IMPUTE EARNINGS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 7/26/16 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
November 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order RLM |
|
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order RLM |
|
August 03, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1070 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S MOTION SET ASIDE JUDGMENT THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: DANIEL J HERING (RE-1) APPEARED IN ROOM 300 WITH DCSS REPRESENTATIVE. BRITNI R BERTOLUCCI (PO-1) APPEARED IN ROOM 300 WITH DCSS REPRESENTATIVE. CALENDAR CALL HELD AT 4:30 PM JONATHAN SHUGART APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. |
|
August 03, 2009 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order RLM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.