Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Jimenez, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Fielder Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time528 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2009 | Hearing | Neither Party Appeared for Mediation | |
June 08, 2009 | Hearing |
4999 Mediation Appointment New Calendar |
|
June 08, 2009 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Mediator, FCS |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
4999 Mediation Appointment New Calendar |
|
May 19, 2009 | Hearing |
Order on Application for Waiver of Fees DENIED IN FULL |
|
May 19, 2009 | Hearing | Application for Waiver of Fee | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order on Application for Waiver of Fees DENIED IN FULL |
|
May 13, 2009 | Hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
May 04, 2009 | Hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for ROAH FAXED TO BPD |
|
May 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS RESTRAINING ORDERS EXPIRE: 04/21/2012 @ 12:00A.M. JUDGE DULCICH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.