Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Benson, Helen, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph W. Wyatt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph W. Wyatt Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryProbate/Full Powers |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions745 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
|
Case Cycle Time1767 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Discharge and Order COMMISSIONER RALPH WM WYATT |
|
October 29, 2012 | Hearing |
Final Discharge and Order COMMISSIONER RALPH WM WYATT |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF R STEVEN DERRYBERRY IN RESPONSE TO COURT CLERK'S REQUEST FOR EXPLANATION | |
July 30, 2012 | Hearing | DECLARATION OF R STEVEN DERRYBERRY IN RESPONSE TO COURT CLERK'S REQUEST FOR EXPLANATION | |
May 09, 2012 | Hearing | Receipt | |
April 20, 2012 | Hearing |
Judgment and Order for Final Distribution ORDER ON SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR; PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT; FOR STATUTORY EXECUTOR'S COMPENSATION; FOR ATTORNEY'S STATUTORY AND EXTRAORDINARY FEES AND FOR ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RWW |
|
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment and Order for Final Distribution ORDER ON SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR; PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT; FOR STATUTORY EXECUTOR'S COMPENSATION; FOR ATTORNEY'S STATUTORY AND EXTRAORDINARY FEES AND FOR ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RWW |
|
March 09, 2012 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice Order on 2nd and final account and report etc was returned becasue the cash on hand amount in para 13 is different from Schedule E. Generally the accounting schedules are not part of the order and can be removed. Comm r signature should be on the last page with sufficient text so his signature does not stand alone. |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Order on 2nd and final account and report etc was returned becasue the cash on hand amount in para 13 is different from Schedule E. Generally the accounting schedules are not part of the order and can be removed. Comm r signature should be on the last page with sufficient text so his signature does not stand alone. |
|
February 24, 2012 | Hearing |
Probate
Judge: Wyatt, Ralph Wm. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.