Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ma, Ryuing, Yoon, Seung Jae, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Park, Calvin J, against Dison, Ruby Anita, represented by Mish, Alan J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLampe, David R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial440 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time440 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2011 | Hearing |
Court Trial Calendar Notes: 4 DAYS//PS' & D'S JURY//MSC 2-18-11 (D-4) 4 DAYS//PS' & D'S JURY//MSC 2-18-11 (D-4) Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Calendar Notes: 4 DAYS//PS' & D'S JURY//MSC 2-18-11 (D-4) 4 DAYS//PS' & D'S JURY//MSC 2-18-11 (D-4) Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
February 18, 2011 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Calendar Notes: TD/FCM 3-14-11 (D-7) TD/FCM 3-14-11 (D-7) Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Calendar Notes: TD/FCM 3-14-11 (D-7) TD/FCM 3-14-11 (D-7) Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
November 17, 2010 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal FILED BY ALAN J. MISH, ESQ |
|
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal FILED BY ALAN J. MISH, ESQ |
|
November 08, 2010 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated Vacating calendar hearing. [calid=1296376] EventCode:4143, CourtDate:03/14/2011, Courtroom:7, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:CTC, Judge:DRL, Deputy:KENNIE, SystemDate:6/28/2010 9:17:06 AM |
|
November 08, 2010 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated Vacating calendar hearing. [calid=1296378] EventCode:4007, CourtDate:02/18/2011, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:7, SessionType:STL, Judge:SPC, Deputy:KENNIE, SystemDate:6/28/2010 9:33:56 AM |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated Vacating calendar hearing. [calid=1296376] EventCode:4143, CourtDate:03/14/2011, Courtroom:7, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:CTC, Judge:DRL, Deputy:KENNIE, SystemDate:6/28/2010 9:17:06 AM |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated Vacating calendar hearing. [calid=1296378] EventCode:4007, CourtDate:02/18/2011, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:7, SessionType:STL, Judge:SPC, Deputy:KENNIE, SystemDate:6/28/2010 9:33:56 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.