Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Security Credit Services Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, against Saucedo, Maria G, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management100 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Time To Trial268 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions268 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3867 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2020 | Hearing | Confidential Document | |
December 27, 2010 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
November 23, 2010 | Hearing |
Accounting Withdrawal of cash bail of $40.00 to the Law Office of Rory Clark completed. |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Accounting Withdrawal of cash bail of $40.00 to the Law Office of Rory Clark completed. |
|
October 28, 2010 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal AND PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal AND PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
October 18, 2010 | Hearing |
152 Pmt: Court Trust Amount of $40.00 for SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC (PL-1). Received from LAW OF OF ROY CLARK, check no(s) 64459. Receipt #553526 for amount of $40.00. |
|
October 18, 2010 | Hearing |
172D Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) Receipt #519447 entered by Deputy #391 on 4/22/2010 in the amount of $40.00 voided due to CLERICAL ERROR; voided by Deputy #262 on 10/18/2010 at 1:42 PM with void transaction #553514. |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
152 Pmt: Court Trust Amount of $40.00 for SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC (PL-1). Received from LAW OF OF ROY CLARK, check no(s) 64459. Receipt #553526 for amount of $40.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.