Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Glover Cv22 Lc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Sims, Ronald S, against Arreola, Julia, Miller, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Brumfield, Lorna H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrumfield, Lorna H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time152 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2010 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 5/26/2010, in Department 17, before the Honorable JOSE R BENAVIDES, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ JOSE R BENAVIDES Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 5/26/2010, in Department 17, before the Honorable JOSE R BENAVIDES, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ JOSE R BENAVIDES Judge of the Superior Court |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 5/26/2010, in Department 17, before the Honorable JOSE R BENAVIDES, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ JOSE R BENAVIDES Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 5/26/2010, in Department 17, before the Honorable JOSE R BENAVIDES, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ JOSE R BENAVIDES Judge of the Superior Court |
|
May 26, 2010 | Hearing |
NP4170 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF OR DEFENDANTS. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
|
May 26, 2010 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Hearing Entered. |
|
May 26, 2010 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Hearing Entered. |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
NP4170 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF OR DEFENDANTS. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
|
April 16, 2010 | Hearing |
Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON 5/26/2010 AT 02:30PM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON 5/26/2010 AT 02:30PM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ JOSE R BENAVIDES Judge of the Superior Court |
|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON 5/26/2010 AT 02:30PM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON 5/26/2010 AT 02:30PM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ JOSE R BENAVIDES Judge of the Superior Court |
|
March 23, 2010 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED 03/15/10 DEFAULT PACKAGE TO RONALD S. SIMS; AFTER CAREFUL REVIEW OF THE COURT ORDER RE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT YOUR DEFAULT IS BEING RETURNED TO YOU FOR CORRECTIONS. PLEASE REFER TO THE COMPLAINT FOR THE CORRECT PROPERTY ADDRESS EXCLUDING THE UNIT NUMBER. PLEASE REVIEW ALL RETURNED PAPERWORK BEFORE RESUBMITTING. RETURNED VIA ALAN NEUMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.