Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D, against Ezell, Elaine, Ezell, Bill L, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions441 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2516 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
November 01, 2011 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied Document Image |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied Document Image |
|
June 22, 2009 | Hearing | Abstract Issued | |
June 22, 2009 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued KERN/MONEY/WER |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued KERN/MONEY/WER |
|
May 27, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFENDANT ELAIN EZELL WAS DISMISSED ON 2/6/09 |
|
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DEFENDANT ELAIN EZELL WAS DISMISSED ON 2/6/09 |
|
May 21, 2009 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). Received from LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICE, check no(s) 132256. Receipt #458016 for amount of $30.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.