Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Smoke Tree Moblie Estates, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mccormack, Sandra Kuhn, against Laughlin, Dennis, represented by Klinchuch, Doug M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time2505 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
May 23, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
April 07, 2008 | Hearing |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: DENNIS LAUGHLIN HOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED DATE SERVED: 1/6/08 MAILED ON 1/7/08 SERVICE FEE: $30.00 WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM WHO SERVED: ALL OTHERS HOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED DATE SERVED: 1/6/08 PREJUDGMENT SERVED TO ALL TENANTS BY POST & MAIL 1/7/08 SERVICE FEE: $30.00 |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: DENNIS LAUGHLIN HOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED DATE SERVED: 1/6/08 MAILED ON 1/7/08 SERVICE FEE: $30.00 WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM WHO SERVED: ALL OTHERS HOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED DATE SERVED: 1/6/08 PREJUDGMENT SERVED TO ALL TENANTS BY POST & MAIL 1/7/08 SERVICE FEE: $30.00 |
|
March 10, 2008 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for SMOKE TREE MOBLIE ESTATES (PL-1). Received from SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK, check no(s) 0719. Receipt #374801 for amount of $15.00. |
|
March 10, 2008 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued VIA AMS |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued VIA AMS |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for SMOKE TREE MOBLIE ESTATES (PL-1). Received from SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK, check no(s) 0719. Receipt #374801 for amount of $15.00. |
|
March 07, 2008 | Hearing |
Declaration and Order OF SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT *******SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ERREA******* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.