Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth, against Osborn, Marie M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2007 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedMay 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 09, 2009 | Hearing | Writ Returned Unsatisfied | |
October 03, 2007 | Hearing |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction ELIZABETH BLEIER ESQ |
|
October 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction ELIZABETH BLEIER ESQ ELIZABETH BLEIER ESQ |
|
October 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction ELIZABETH BLEIER ESQ |
|
October 01, 2007 | Hearing |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar New Calendar |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar |
|
August 23, 2007 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). Received from BLEIER. Receipt #333851 for amount of $15.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.