Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Frost, Lula, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Supplemental Petition Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate Updated Notes - Hearing 10/6/2021
Date: October 05, 2021Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate Hearing 10/6/2021
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Lula Frost
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Lula Frost
Date: August 17, 2021Petition for Letters of Administration Filed (Amended)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: September 30, 2021Proof of Publication As to Cecil E. Davis Filed
Date: August 30, 2021Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.