Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sorensen, Patrick, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Delbert C. Gee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDelbert C. Gee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2019 |
CategoryDetermine Property Of Trust |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time100 days |
Order Determining Title of Real Property As Trust Asset Filed
Date: June 14, 2019Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Patrick Sorensen
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Trust Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: May 15, 2019Amended Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Copy of Certified Death Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: May 15, 2019Trust Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: June 14, 2019Supplemental Declaration to Petition Filed
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Examiner's Notes re (REVISED) Petition for Order Determining Title to Real Property, 5/15/19
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Examiner's Notes re Petition for Order Determining Title to Real Property, 5/15/19
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.