We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Batres Vs Gasca-Martinez

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Batres , Susana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Gasca-Martinez , Ivan Edmundo, Nong, Anh Hung, Phan , Uyen, Reilly Designs, Inc., Reilly, Scott, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

September 02, 2020

Last Refreshed

June 04, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Auto Tort

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Automobile

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00

Proof of Service Filed

Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00

Amendment to Complaint Filed

Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00

Tentative Case Management Order

Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description

Judge: Case Management Conference

Docket Event Case Management Statement of Ivan Edmundo Gasca-Martinez, Scott Reilly Filed
Docket Event Case Management Statement of Susana Batres Filed
Docket Event Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Docket Event Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed
Docket Event Answer to Complaint Filed for Uyen Phan, Anh Hung Nong
Docket Event Stipulation to Set Aside Default Filed
Docket Event Answer to Complaint Filed for Reilly Designs, Inc.
Case Management Conference

Judge: Stephen Pulido

Docket Event Case Management Conf Continuance 06/03/2021 03:00 PM D- 517
See all events