We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Mc Knight Vs City Of Oakland

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Mc Knight , Shirley, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Cac Real Estate Investment Company , Inc, City Of Oakland, Sparknight Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

June 28, 2018

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Other Pi/Pd/Wd Tort

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

General Torts

Case Cycle Time

298 days

Time To Management

138 days

Time To Trial

138 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Docket Event Hearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 12/02/2019 08:30 AM D- 22
Docket Event Hearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 11/01/2019 08:30 AM D- 22
Docket Event Hearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 10/23/2019 09:00 AM D- 302
Docket Event Compliance Hearing 05/13/2019 03:00 PM D- 22
Docket Event Notice of Settlement Filed for Shirley MC Knight
Case Management Conference

Judge: Robert McGuiness

Docket Event Civil Jury Trial 12/02/2019 08:30 AM D- 22
See all events