We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Jones Vs Worldpac, Inc.

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Jones, Joyce, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Worldpac, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

March 15, 2018

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Wrongful Termination

Practice Area

Labor and Employment

Matter Type

Wrongful Termination

Case Cycle Time

371 days

Time To Management

137 days

Time To Trial

137 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/08/2019 03:00 PM D- 18
Docket Event Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Case Management Conference

Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee

Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Referred to Private Mediation
Docket Event Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Case Management Conf Continuance 12/07/2018 09:00 AM D- 18
Docket Event Civil Jury Trial 08/26/2019 08:30 AM D- 18
See all events