We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Scott Vs Gay

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Scott , Valerie, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Eden Medical Center, Gay, Andre M.D, Valley Pointeidence Opco, Llc, Wang, Yang M.D, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

March 02, 2018

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Medical Malpractice

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Malpractice

Case Cycle Time

551 days

Time To Management

145 days

Time To Trial

145 days

Time to First Dismissal Order

424 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00

Notice of Mediation date Filed

Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Docket Event Case Management Statement of Yang Wang M.D Filed
Docket Event Case Management Statement of Andre Gay M.D Filed
Continuance of Trial Date

Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee

Docket Event Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/13/2019 09:00 AM D- 18
Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Hearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 09/09/2019 08:30 AM D- 18
Docket Event Hearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/05/2019 09:00 AM D- 303
See all events