We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Hsieh Vs Asian Network Physical Therapy & Rehabilitation

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Hsieh, Calvin, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Asian Network Physical Therapy & Rehabilitation, Hong, Nikole, Kwong, Ivy, Ngo, Christina, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

August 11, 2017

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Medical Malpractice

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Malpractice

Case Cycle Time

381 days

Time To Management

145 days

Time To Trial

145 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Association of Attorneys Filed

Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Case Management Conference

Judge: Paul D. Herbert

Docket Event Civil Jury Trial 02/19/2019 08:30 AM D- 20
Docket Event Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 01/09/2019 09:00 AM D- 302
Docket Event Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Case Management Conf Continuance 02/06/2019 03:00 PM D- 20
Docket Event Case Management Statement of Asian Network Physical Therapy & Rehabilitation, Christina Ngo, Nikole
Docket Event Notice of posting jury fees Filed
See all events