We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Wozniak Vs Emergency Essentials, Llc

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Wozniak, Paul, filed a(n) General Civil - Civil case against Emergency Essentials, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

June 19, 2017

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Other Complaint

Practice Area

Civil

Matter Type

General Civil

Case Cycle Time

270 days

Time To Management

135 days

Time To Trial

135 days

Time to First Dismissal Order

270 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Statement Filed

Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00

Motion Granted

Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00

Complaint - Other Filed

Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00

Judgment Entered

Date: March 16, 2018

Case Events

Type Description
Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement

Judge: Winifred Y. Smith

Case Management Conference

Judge: Winifred Y. Smith

Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Granted
Docket Event Judgment Entire Action Filed
Docket Event Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Judgment Entered
Docket Event Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement 03/16/2018 11:00 AM D- 21
See all events