We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Rossi Vs Bourbon And Beef, Burritos Inc.

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Mehra, Vidya, Rossi, Anastasia, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Bourbon And Beef, Burritos Inc., Burritos Inc., Jones, Damien, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

February 17, 2017

Last Refreshed

February 24, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Wrongful Termination

Practice Area

Labor and Employment

Matter Type

Wrongful Termination

Case Cycle Time

378 days

Time To Management

4 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Proof of Service Filed

Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00

Summons Issued and Filed

Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00

First Amended Complaint Filed

Date: February 09, 2018

Motion Denied

Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00

Proposed Judgment Received

Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00

Summons Issued and Filed

Date: February 09, 2018

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Docket Event First Amended Complaint Filed
Docket Event Summons Issued and Filed
Case Management Conference

Judge: Robert McGuiness

Docket Event Case Management Conf Continuance 04/26/2018 03:00 PM D- 22
Docket Event Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Case Management Statement of Anastasia Rossi, Vidya Mehra Filed
Case Management Conference

Judge: Robert McGuiness

See all events