Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sysco San Francisco, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Burritos Inc., Massarweh, Abraham, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2017 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions57 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time407 days |
Declaration of Malcolm Leader-Picone Re Interest Filed
Date: May 15, 2017Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Burritos Inc., Abraham Massarweh File
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Rejected
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sysco San Francisco, Inc.
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Burritos Inc. Filed
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Sysco San Francisco, Inc. Filed
Date: June 21, 2017Compliance Hearing 03/29/2018 09:00 AM D- 301
Date: February 09, 2018Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: March 22, 2018Proof of Service on Complaint As to Abraham Massarweh Filed
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/29/2018 09:00 AM D- 303
Date: February 22, 2018Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: July 12, 2017Response Filed
Date: March 22, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.