Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Freshpoint, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Bourbon And Beef, Inc, Burritos, Inc, Jones, Damien, Masarweh, Abraham, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Wynne S. Carvill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWynne S. Carvill Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time868 days |
Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Damien Jones Filed
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Application Re: Entry of Judgment Granted
Date: March 23, 2017Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for FreshPoint, Inc.
Date: June 27, 2017Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bourbon and Beef, Inc Filed
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Application Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for FreshPoint, Inc.
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Abstract of Judgment
Date: July 11, 2017Proof of Service on Complaint As to Burritos, Inc Filed
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Stipulation for Settlement or Judgment Filed
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Abraham Masarweh Filed
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for FreshPoint, Inc.
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 03/23/2017 09:15 AM D- 511
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Alameda Filed
Date: May 08, 2019Rejection Letter Issued on Abstract of Judgment
Date: April 04, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.