Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia , Melisa, Cervantes , Salvador, Cervantes , Ofelia, Cervantes , Martha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Williams , Brandi, Enterprise Rent A Car Company Of San Francisco,Llc, Enterprise Rent A Car Company Of Los Angeles Llc, Enterprise Rent A Car, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: October 02, 2015Initial Case Management Conference 01/15/2016 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: September 08, 2015Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: December 16, 2015Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: September 08, 2015Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: September 02, 2015Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: September 02, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.