We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Singh Vs Mathew Enterprise, Inc. A California Corporation

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Singh, Satinderpal, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Mathew Enterprise, Inc. A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

June 20, 2012

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Other Employment

Practice Area

Labor and Employment

Matter Type

General Employment

Case Cycle Time

436 days

Time To Management

134 days

Time To Trial

307 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

Date: 2012-06-20T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Docket Event Order Setting Civil Case for Trial (Amended) Filed
Docket Event Order Setting Civil Case for Trial Filed
Docket Event Case Management Conf Continuance 11/26/2013 09:15 AM D- 15
Case Management Conference

Judge: Ioana Petrou

Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Civil Jury Trial 12/09/2013 10:00 AM D- 15
Docket Event Refer to Private Arbitration
Docket Event Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
See all events