We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Kwon Vs Bank Of America, N.A., A Business Entity Form Unknow

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Kwon, Catherine, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Bank Of America, N.A., A Business Entity Form Unknown, Recontrust Company, N.A., A Business Entity Form Unknown, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

February 22, 2012

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Other Real Property

Practice Area

Property

Matter Type

General Property

Case Cycle Time

386 days

Time To Management

201 days

Time to First Dismissal Order

212 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Proof of Service on Motion

Date: 2012-12-19T00:00:00

Proposed Order Received

Date: 2012-09-17T00:00:00

Proof of Service Filed

Date: 2012-09-10T00:00:00

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Date: 2012-09-27T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Case Management Conference

Judge: John M. True, III

Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Amend

Judge: John M. True, III

Docket Event Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Amend Granted
Case Management Conference

Judge: John M. True, III

Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Case Management Conf Continuance 03/14/2013 03:00 PM D- 23
See all events