We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Citibank (South Dakota)N.A. Vs Partee

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Partee , Tommie L, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

April 13, 2011

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Collections

Practice Area

Creditor

Matter Type

Collections

Case Cycle Time

730 days

Time To Management

153 days

Time To Trial

244 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Notice of Appearance Filed

Date: 2011-05-26T00:00:00

Declaration Filed

Date: 2012-03-06T00:00:00

Complaint - Collections Filed

Date: 2011-04-13T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal with prejudice - entire action
Compliance Hearing

Judge: Delbert C. Gee

Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Complaint - Collections Dismissed
Docket Event Stipulation and Order Re: Conditional Settlement Granted
Docket Event Stipulation and Order Re: Conditional Settlement Filed for Citibank (South Dakota)N.A.
Docket Event Civil Jury Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 510 date: 04/06/2012 time: 09:00 AM
Docket Event Compliance Hearing 08/02/2012 08:45 AM D- 510
Docket Event Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
See all events