Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Andrew Whaley Visinger filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Therese M. Zartman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTherese M. Zartman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 06, 2006 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time23 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS FILE SCANNED Not Applicable |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
CLETS VALIDATION COMPLETED Not Applicable |
|
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
CLETS VALIDATION COMPLETED Not Applicable |
|
July 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
CLETS VALIDATION COMPLETED Not Applicable |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HRG BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 04/01/07 AS TO ANDREW VISINGER, FILED. Not Applicable |
|
December 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
FAMILY COURT SERVICES: MEDIATION DATE 06/03/2024 Not Applicable |
|
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFTER HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED -- HEARING DATE 112906. Not Applicable |
|
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY CAROLYN VISINGER - Minutes Pre-D Complete JUDGE PRO TEM: THERESE M. ZARTMAN PRESIDING CLERK: STEPHANIE WALKER REPORTER: FRED BERZAK BAILIFF: C PETERSON - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER CAROLYN VISINGER PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANDREW WHALEY VISINGER - PROCEEDINGS: PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM. STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED. - WITNESS -- CAROLYN VISINGER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD. REQUESTED ORDERS GRANTED - RESTRAINING ORDERS ANDREW WHALEY VISINGER IS ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED FROM HARASS, ATTACK, STRIKE, THREATEN, ASSAULT (SEXUALLY OR OTHERWISE), HIT, FOLLOW, STALK, MOLEST, DESTROY PERSONAL PROPERTY, DISTURB THE PEACE, KEEP UNDER SURVEILLANCE, OR BLOCK MOVEMENTS. CONTACT (EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY), OR TELEPHONE, OR SEND MESSAGES OR E-MAIL. AND THE FOLLOWING FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD MEMBERS: OSIRUS LEO VINCENT VISINGER EXCEPT FOR BRIEF AND PEACEFUL CONTACT AS REQUIRED FOR COURT-ORDERDED VISITATION OF THE CHILDREN UNLESS A CRIMINAL PROTECTIVE ORDER SAYS OTHERWISE. PEACEFUL WRITTEN CONTACT THROUGH A LAWYER OR A PROCESS SERVER OR ANOTHER PERSON IN ORDER TO SERVE LEGAL PAPERS IS ALLOWED AND DOES NOT VIOLATE THIS ORDER. NO VISITATION IS ORDERED FOR ANDREW VISINGER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION ARE ORDERED ON THE FORM DV-140 OR : -. ANDREW WHALEY VISINGER IS ORDERED TO STAY AWAY AT LEAST 100 YARDS FROM CAROLYN VISINGER AND THE FAMILY AND HOUSEHOLD MEMBERS LISTED ABOVE. PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER'S RESIDENCE PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER'S VEHICLE. PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER'S CHILDREN'S SCHOOL OR PLACE OF CHILD CARE. ANDREW WHALEY VISINGER MUST SELL TO A LICENSED GUN DEALER OR TURN IN TO POLICE ANY GUNS OR FIREARMS THAT HE OR SHE HAS OR CONTROLS. THIS MUST BE DONE WITHIN 48 HOURS OF RECEIVING THIS ORDER. BUT IF THE RESTRAINED PERSON WAS AT A HEARING FOR THIS ORDER, IT MUST BE DONE WITHIN 24 HOURS OF THE HEARING. ANDREW WHALEY VISINGER MUST BRING A RECEIPT TO THE COURT WITHIN 72 HOURS OF RECEIVING THIS ORDER,TO PROVE THAT GUNS OR FIREARMS HAVE BEEN TURNED IN OR SOLD. THE PROTECTED PERSON MAY RECORD ANY PROHIBITED COMMUNICATIONS MADE TO HIM OR HER BY THE RESTRAINED PERSON. THIS ORDER SHALL EXPIRE AT MIDNIGHT ON 11/29/09 THE PREVAILING PARTY/ CAROLYN VISINGER SHALL PREPARE THE ORDER AFTER HEARING AND TRANSMIT COPIES OF IT TO THE APPROPRIATE LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCIES. - PURSUANT TO FAMILY CODE SECTION 3048, THE COURT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CUSTODY UNDER THE FAMILY CODE AND THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT. NOTICE AND OPPORTUNITY TO BE HEARD WAS GIVEN TO THE PARTIES/RESPONDING PARTY AS PROVIDED BY THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. THE COUNTRY OF HABITUAL RESIDENCE OF THE CHILD/CHILDREN IS THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. THE COURT HAS CONSIDERED THE FACTORS SET FORTH IN FAMILY CODE 3048(B)(1) AND FINDS THAT THERE IS NOT A RISK OF ABDUCTION OF THE CHILD BY EITHER PARTY. A VIOLATION OF THIS CUSTODY ORDER MAY SUBJECT A PARTY FOUND IN VIOLATION TO CIVIL OR CRIMINAL PENALTIES, OR BOTH. ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM: THERESE M. ZARTMAN PRESIDING |
|
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ANDREW WHALEY VISINGER; PARTY SERVED ON 11/10/06. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. Not Applicable |
|
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) FILED. HEARING DATE: 11/29/06. ORDER EXPIRES: 11/29/09. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.