Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stevens, Richard O., Stevens, William A, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ross C. Moody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss C. Moody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryTrust (Petition For Order Determing Trust'S Title To Real Property) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2022 | Hearing |
Petition For Order Determing Trust'S Title To Real Property
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
August 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion For Proceeding To Be Continued By Successor Trustee
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
August 01, 2022 | Hearing |
Petition For Order Determing Trust'S Title To Real Property
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER DETERMING TRUST'S TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY CONTINUED FROM AUG-01-2022 TO SEP-14-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67773406) FILED BY PETITIONER STEVENS, WILLIAM A | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PROCEEDING TO BE CONTINUED BY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE (TRANSACTION ID # 67735147) FILED BY PETITIONER STEVENS, WILLIAM A HEARING SET FOR AUG-18-2022 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 204 | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROCEEDING TO BE CONTINUED BY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE (TRANSACTION ID # 67735147) FILED BY PETITIONER STEVENS, WILLIAM A | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF WILLIAM A. STEVENS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE PENDING ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 67735147) FILED BY PETITIONER STEVENS, WILLIAM A | |
June 08, 2022 | Hearing |
Petition For Order Determing Trust'S Title To Real Property
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER DETERMING TRUST'S TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY CONTINUED FROM JUN-08-2022 TO AUG-01-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.