Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ortiz-Garcia, Jesus Gonzalo, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report Memo |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To LODGED DOCUMENTS SENT TO CAL SHELF |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Due Diligence | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents Proposed Letters |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate FILED |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Investigator SIGNED ON 6/17/2022 |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR SENT TO JUDGE RICHARDSON |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Decl Under Uniform Child Custody Juris & Enf Act (UCCJEA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.