Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcelroy, Bernadette Scribner, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order STIP/ORD AFT MEDIATE Notes: STIPULATION & ORDER AFTER MEDIATION FILED |
|
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Petition GUARDIANSHIP OF STUBBLEFIELD GUARDIAN PRESENT BERNADETTE MCELROY WITH/BY ATTORNEY: KRYSTAL CALAWAY FATHER PRESENT COURT ACKS REPORT OF COURT INVESTIGATOR PETN GRANTED PARTIES REFERRED TO MEDIATION W/AGNES SILVA STIPULATION REACH AND SO ORDERED MOTHER REFUSED DRUG TES ORDER AND LEFT COURT SEE MO IN CASE #FS 05-773 Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Investigative Report COURT INVESTIG RPT Notes: COURT INVESTIGATOR'S REPORT |
|
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Temporary Guardian ORD APPT TEMPORARY* Notes: ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY GUARDIAN/PERSON/ESTATE |
|
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letters of Temporary Guardianship LTRS-TEMP GUARDIAN Notes: LETTERS OF TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP |
|
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing PETITIONER PRESENT W/COUNSEL; MOTHER AND FATHER PRESENT. COURT CONTINUED TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP AT THE REQUEST OF CONSEL. PARENTS ARE TO FILE OSC RE: CUSTODY IN FAMILY LAW FILE AND SET THE HEARING DATE TO COINCIDE WITH THIS MATTER. COURT REFERS THIS MATTER BACK TO JOHN LAURICELLA FOR A SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT TO INCLUDE AN INTERVIEW W/ FATHER. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed TRIAL BRIEF FILED Notes: BY PETITIONER |
|
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: UCCJEA by Russell M. Stubblefield |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CALENDAR FILE AWAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.