Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collins, Geraldine Francis, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with White, Kathleen M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhite, Kathleen M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 1978 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Petition ATTNY ROBERT NAKKEN PRESENT. PTN GRANTED. ORDER SIGNE D IN OPEN COURT. ATTNY NAKKEN DIRECTED TO FILE IN RM. 103. Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Petition Granted PETN GRANTED |
|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: TO CONFIRM SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE; TO ASCERTAIN REMAINDER BENEFICIARIES OF THE TRUST, TO MODIFY A PROVISION OF THE TRUST BASED ON CHANGED CIRCUMSTANCES | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: PROBATE FILE AWAY |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Petition NO APPEARANCES. CONT TO 2/7/08 AT 9AM IN DPT1 FOR PTN Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: MEMO FROM KAREN HENDRICKS AT GARDNER, JANES, NAKKEN, HUGO & NOLAN | |
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING* Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PET TO CONFIRM SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE ; TO ASCERTAIN REMAINDER BENEFICIARIES OF THE TRUST; TO MODIFY A PROVISION OF THE TRUST BASED ON CHANGED C IRCUMSTANCES by Petitioner Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.