Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Weinberg, Simon, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Stephen M. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen M. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint document is related to the estate of Dana Weinberg, who is the decedent. The document outlines the duties and liabilities of the personal representative appointed by the court to manage the estate. The personal representative is requir...
PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 65727738)
Date: June 26, 2020DECLARATION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER WEINBERG, SIMON
Date: June 18, 2020CREDITOR'S CLAIM FOR $2,000,000.00 (TRANSACTION ID # 66376050) FILED BY CREDITOR WEINBERG, TERRY
Date: February 26, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67170356) FILED BY PETITIONER WEINBERG, SIMON
Date: December 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE WEINBERG, SIMON | |
March 07, 2023 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #1, Report, Fees, Final Distribution
Judge: STEPHEN M. MURPHY |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF MAR-07-2023, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SEBASTIAN WEINBERG IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR; PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES TO PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 69262281) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE WEINBERG, SIMON | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR AND PETITION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT; PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF ATTORNEYS? STATUTORY FEES AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 69200744) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE WEINBERG, SIMON | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ADMINISTRATOR SIMON WEINBERG IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR; PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES TO PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 69200744) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE WEINBERG, SIMON | |
January 31, 2023 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #1, Report, Fees, Final Distribution
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM JAN-31-2023 TO MAR-07-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
November 08, 2022 | Hearing |
PROBATE ACCOUNTING STATUS PETITION
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PROBATE ACCOUNTING STATUS PETITION, CALENDAR OF NOV-08-2022, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.