Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Thomas, Anita Gail, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Peter J. Busch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter J. Busch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time620 days |
This complaint is a supplement to the first and final report of the status of administration and petition for various allowances and distributions in the estate of Gracie Lee Simon. The petitioner, Anita Thomas, who is the executor of the estate, req...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2018 | Hearing |
ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Status Of Closing The Estate
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR STATUS OF CLOSING THE ESTATE, CALENDAR OF SEP-11-2018, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT | |
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION REPORT, FEES | |
November 21, 2017 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF NOV-21-2017, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 61353798) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE THOMAS, ANITA GAIL | |
November 07, 2017 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION CONTINUED FROM NOV-07-2017 TO NOV-21-2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDMENT TO FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION TO ATTORNEY FOR STATUTORY FEES; FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS ADVANCED BY ATTORNEY; FOR COMPENSATION FOR ATTORNEYS EXTRAORDINARY SERVICES; AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 61288340) FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, ANITA GAIL | |
October 17, 2017 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.