Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dolch, Debra J., Steele, Don C., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Ross C. Moody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss C. Moody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 18, 2004 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE REFEREE FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: January 02, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 67195351) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: December 27, 2021ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #5, REPORT FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66829408) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: August 06, 2021ORDER SETTLING FIRST ACCOUNT AND STATUS REPORT AND CONTINUING ESTATE ADMINISTRATION
Date: October 08, 2019ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: February 16, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 64478713) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: December 02, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 65941257) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: September 17, 2020ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: August 19, 2020ORDER FOR RATIFICATION OF TRUSTEE'S AUTH. TO SELL REAL PROP. AND PERSONAL PROP.
Date: June 30, 2005ORDER INCREASING BOND TO $508,000.00 FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: March 30, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 62156725) FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: June 20, 2018ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: November 16, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: October 19, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: May 31, 2005PROOF OF POSTING OF NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: October 13, 2005NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: August 06, 2004ORDER TAKING JURISDICTION OF DECEDENT'S LIVING TRUST
Date: July 23, 2004PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: May 19, 2004ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (CHRISTY STYER) FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: June 22, 2004PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: July 20, 2004PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: May 26, 2004NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING
Date: June 15, 2004PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)
Date: May 27, 2004WILL ADMITTED JULY 12, 2004
Date: July 12, 2004PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: June 25, 2004NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY PETITIONER STEELE, DON C.
Date: May 18, 2004PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68341229) FILED BY REQUESTOR ROYAL INSTITUTE FOR THE BLIND
Date: November 02, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 69736990) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: April 05, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING (CORRECTED) (TRANSACTION ID # 69137683) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: February 14, 2023ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #6, REPORT FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: December 13, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 68341229) FILED BY ATTORNEY MOFFIT, JEREMIAH JAMES
Date: November 02, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 68212231) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: October 04, 2022REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68510940) FILED BY REQUESTOR CARR MCCLELLAN P.C.
Date: December 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #7, Report
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
September 11, 2023 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #7, Report
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #7, REPORT CONTINUED FROM SEP-11-2023 TO OCT-30-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PROBATE EXAMINERS NOTES AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE TO CORRECT ERRORS (TRANSACTION ID # 70752470) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DOLCH, DEBRA J. | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON AMENDED PETITION TO CONFIRM FORFEITURE OF INTEREST IN PROBATE ESTATE AND FOR COURT DETERMINATION OF THE PERSONS ENTITLED TO DISTRIBUTION OF THE DECEDENT'S ESTATE | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION TO CONFIRM FORFEITURE OF INTEREST IN PROBATE ESTATE, CALENDAR OF AUG-22-2023, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
August 22, 2023 | Hearing |
Petition To Confirm Forfeiture Of Interest In Probate Estate
Judge: STEPHEN M. MURPHY |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (FURTHER AMENDED) (TRANSACTION ID # 70648257) FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DOLCH, DEBRA J. | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION TO CONFIRM FORFEITURE OF INTEREST IN PROBATE ESTATE CONTINUED FROM AUG-01-2023 TO AUG-22-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
August 01, 2023 | Hearing |
Petition To Confirm Forfeiture Of Interest In Probate Estate
Judge: STEPHEN M. MURPHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.