Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Daneille R Lapoint, Danielle R Lapoint, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Martin, Trinidad Martinez, against Jeffrey S Lapoint, represented by Donahue, Elizabeth Ann, Judd, Karen Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Kelly S Mckeighan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKelly S Mckeighan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
March 18, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
March 01, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
February 17, 2022 | INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT | ||
February 15, 2022 | INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT | ||
February 15, 2022 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
February 15, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
February 15, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
February 08, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL | ||
February 08, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.